Assembly | 02/13/2024 | signed chap.84 | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.195 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8071 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.265 | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/10/2024 | referred to governmental operations |