Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s8504a | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | rules report cal.571 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2024 | print number 8595a | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2024 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |