Assembly | 02/07/2024 | signed chap.48 | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.193 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8063 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.287 | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2024 | referred to judiciary |