Assembly | 12/21/2024 | approval memo.63 | ||
Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.625 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1496 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8119C | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.400 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | rules report cal.400 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2024 | print number 8837c | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2024 | print number 8837b | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2024 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | print number 8837a | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2024 | referred to veterans' affairs |