Assembly | 09/27/2024 | signed chap.351 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1897 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9307A | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.330 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.330 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | print number 8842a | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | amend and recommit to local governments | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2024 | referred to local governments |