Assembly | 11/22/2024 | signed chap.483 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.308 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7383A | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.536 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | rules report cal.536 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | print number 8864a | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to cities | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2024 | referred to cities |