Assembly | 09/04/2024 | signed chap.303 | ||
Assembly | 09/04/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.378 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8216A | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.335 | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2024 | referred to governmental employees |