Assembly | 12/21/2024 | approval memo.64 | ||
Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.627 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1708 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8197 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.334 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.334 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2024 | referred to banks |