Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.258 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.258 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | print number 8914a | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2024 | referred to veterans' affairs |