Assembly | 05/31/2024 | print number 8935c | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | print number 8935b | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | amend and recommit to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2024 | print number 8935a | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2024 | amend and recommit to labor | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2024 | referred to labor |