Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted by s9305a | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.337 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | print number 8960b | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | amend and recommit to transportation | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | print number 8960a | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2024 | referred to transportation |