Assembly | 06/28/2024 | signed chap.127 | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1493 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7974A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.181 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.181 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | print number 8970a | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |