Assembly | 12/21/2024 | approval memo.66 | ||
Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.629 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1133 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7296A | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.433 | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2024 | print number 8978a | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2024 | amend and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |