Assembly | 06/28/2024 | signed chap.128 | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.742 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8469A | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.469 | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | print number 8982a | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | amend and recommit to transportation | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | referred to transportation |