Assembly | 05/23/2024 | signed chap.118 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.924 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8473 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.411 | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2024 | referred to local governments |