Assembly | 11/26/2024 | signed chap.543 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.787 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7739B | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | REFERRED TO CODES | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.112 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | rules report cal.112 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | print number 8994a | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2024 | referred to consumer affairs and protection |