Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted by s4550b | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.338 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2024 | print number 8998b | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2024 | amend and recommit to transportation | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2024 | print number 8998a | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2024 | referred to transportation |