Assembly | 05/16/2024 | substituted by s8145 | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.54 | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | rules report cal.54 | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2024 | referred to local governments |