Assembly | 08/28/2024 | signed chap.241 | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.697 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7093A | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.403 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | rules report cal.403 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | print number 9076a | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | amend and recommit to libraries and education technology | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2024 | referred to libraries and education technology |