Assembly | 12/13/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/13/2024 | vetoed memo.82 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1709 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8408 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.340 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.340 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2024 | referred to governmental employees |