Assembly | 09/27/2024 | signed chap.352 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1211 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8505 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.392 | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | referred to local governments |