Assembly | 11/22/2024 | signed chap.484 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1419 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8443 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.117 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | rules report cal.117 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | referred to economic development |