Assembly | 05/23/2024 | substituted by s8448 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.118 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | rules report cal.118 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | referred to libraries and education technology |