Assembly | 06/28/2024 | signed chap.129 | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1294 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9377A | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | repassed assembly | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | amended on third reading 9166b | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | amended on third reading (t) 9166a | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | recalled from senate | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.322 | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | reported |