Senate | 05/28/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.472 | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | referred to correction |