Assembly | 11/22/2024 | signed chap.486 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1585 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8668 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.191 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.191 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2024 | referred to education |