Assembly | 12/13/2024 | approval memo.32 | ||
Assembly | 12/13/2024 | signed chap.562 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.998 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8966A | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.76 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | rules report cal.76 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2024 | print number 9235a | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2024 | amend and recommit to health |