Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.503 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | rules report cal.503 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2024 | print number 9312b | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2024 | amend and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | print number 9312a | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2024 | referred to governmental operations |