Assembly | 08/28/2024 | signed chap.244 | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1046 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8678 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.475 | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2024 | referred to governmental operations |