Assembly | 12/13/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/13/2024 | vetoed memo.85 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1582 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8529 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.406 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | rules report cal.406 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2024 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2024 | referred to governmental employees |