Assembly | 09/27/2024 | signed chap.356 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.801 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9021A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | RECOMMITTED TO INSURANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | repassed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | amended on third reading 9407a | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | recalled from senate | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.379 | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2024 | reported |