Assembly | 08/06/2024 | signed chap.215 | ||
Assembly | 08/06/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.631 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8464 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.380 | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2024 | referred to election law |