Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted by s7543b | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.459 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | rules report cal.459 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | amend and recommit to rules 9430b | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | print number 9430a | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | amend and recommit to science and technology | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2024 | referred to science and technology |