Assembly | 06/28/2024 | signed chap.130 | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1517 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8909 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.267 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.267 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2024 | referred to real property taxation |