Assembly | 11/22/2024 | signed chap.489 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1128 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8776A | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.348 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.348 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | print number 9458b | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to racing and wagering | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | print number 9458a | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2024 | referred to racing and wagering |