Assembly | 06/28/2024 | signed chap.131 | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1027 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8899 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | REFERRED TO CITIES 2 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.56 | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | rules report cal.56 | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2024 | referred to cities |