Assembly | 06/28/2024 | signed chap.132 | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.675 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8674 | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.394 | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | reported |