Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s9032a | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | amended on third reading (t) 9478a | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.194 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.194 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2024 | referred to judiciary |