Assembly | 09/27/2024 | signed chap.357 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.831 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9015 | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.381 | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | reported |