Assembly | 09/27/2024 | signed chap.359 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1896 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9306 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.477 | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2024 | referred to local governments |