Assembly | 11/11/2024 | signed chap.448 | ||
Assembly | 11/08/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1360 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6715B | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.270 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.270 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means |