Assembly | 06/28/2024 | signed chap.137 | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1268 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9347 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | REFERRED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.415 | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2024 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |