Assembly | 08/28/2024 | signed chap.246 | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1437 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9003 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.388 | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2024 | referred to economic development |