Assembly | 12/21/2024 | approval memo.70 | ||
Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.634 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1779 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9174B | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | amended on third reading 9616c | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.272 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.272 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | print number 9616b | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | amend and recommit to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | print number 9616a | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | referred to consumer affairs and protection |