Senate | 06/04/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | amended on third reading 9621a | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.416 | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | referred to governmental operations |