Assembly | 12/13/2024 | signed chap.565 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1403 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9144 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.273 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.273 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | referred to health |