Assembly | 06/28/2024 | signed chap.139 | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1340 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9416 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.398 | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2024 | referred to cities |