Assembly | 07/24/2024 | amended by restoring to previous print 9673a | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | amend by restoring to original print 9673 | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | print number 9673c | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | print number 9673b | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | print number 9673a | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | referred to real property taxation |