Assembly | 12/13/2024 | approval memo.34 | ||
Assembly | 12/13/2024 | signed chap.566 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.125 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5597B | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO BANKS | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.81 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | rules report cal.81 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to rules |