Assembly | 08/28/2024 | signed chap.249 | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1052 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8945 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.412 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | rules report cal.412 | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2024 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | referred to governmental operations |